judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS AVERY GLENN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0132)
Case Number:S-11-0132Case Docketed On:05/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:THOMAS AVERY GLENN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:THOMAS AVERY GLENN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas Avery Glenn Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 135
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/06/2011Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
07/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/06/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2011Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
07/25/2011Order - Granting Permission for Court-Appointed Counsel to WithdrawOrderGrantFinal
09/13/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellant Ander's BriefBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
09/21/2011Opinion - Published order Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/07/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/07/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal