judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALONZO R. VAUGHN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0228
Short Caption:ALONZO R. VAUGHN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:11-CF-0228Consolidated: 11-CF-0363
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-27306-08Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/09/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/24/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Peter S. SmithNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/23/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-134 and 11-CF-228 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Corylee Carlyle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn in appeal no. 11-CF-228. F/O that counsel for appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to theappeal have been ordered an shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appelalnt must advise the Court Reporting and recording Divsion to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/01/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (Johnson)(no oppo).
04/01/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Statement Regarding Transcript (Johnson).
04/05/2011 On consideration of appellant Bobby Johnson's unopposed motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant Johnson's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn's statement regarding transcript remain due on or before April 22, 2011. (Castillo)
04/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)-Bobby Johnson
04/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (VAUGHN) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
04/26/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CF-363 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 11-CF-134 and 11-CF-228 for all purposes herein. F/O, sua sponte, that the appointment of Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Tom Paynter, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant Bobby Johnson in appeal no. 11-CF-134 herein. Sydney Hoffman, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to appeal no. 11-CF-134 to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that Sal Pilchen, Esquire and Amanda R. Grier, Esquire, are hereby assigned as pro bono counsel representing appellant Carl S. Morton in appeal no. 11-CF-363. F/O that counsel for appellant Carl S. Morton shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of thisorder complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (ETW)
05/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11CF363) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/09/2011APPEARANCE of Thomas C. Paynter as counsel for Appellant (Counsel was already on this case for Appellant).
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (19 pgs/Jeon) 7/26/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (227 pgs/Zamora) 7/27/10 proc
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (114 pgs/Zamora) 7/28/10 proc
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (61 pgs/Zamora) 7/29/10 proc
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (36 pgs/Coney) 8/2/10 proc.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (45 pgs/Coney) 8/3/10 proc w/cd
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #7 (16pgs/Tape) 4/23/10 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #8 (30pgs/Tape) 6/25/10 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #9 (25pgs/Etekochay) 10/22/10 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #10 (15pgs/Price) 3/18/11 proc.
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-363)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-363)
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (SEALED pleadings)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-228)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-228)
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (124 pgs.Janifer) 11/2/09 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (178 pgs/Janifer) 11/3/09 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (179-375 pgs/Janifer) 11/4/09 proc
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (232 pgs/Shelton) 11/5/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (157 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 11/9/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (12 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 11/10/09 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (112 pgs/White) 1/14/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (59 pgs/Hamilton) 2/11/11 proc.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (17 pgs/tape) 2/16/11 proc w/cd
08/18/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/18/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (SEALED PLEADINGS)
08/18/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-134)
08/18/2011FiledRecord Index (11-cf-134)
09/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/23/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte severing appeal no. 11-CF-134 from consolidated appeals nos. 11-CF-228 & 11-CF-363.
10/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (both Appellant's)
10/13/2011FiledOrder Granting joint motion of appellants for extension of time/ briefs and appendixes to 12/2/11.
11/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's joint motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/16/12.
01/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (joint) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/7/12.
02/07/2012FiledBrief (Vaughn) (Appellant)
02/07/2012FiledAppendix (Vaughn) (Appellant)
02/07/2012FiledBrief (Morton) (Appellant)
02/07/2012FiledAppendix (Volumes 1 & 2)(Morton) (Appellant)
02/07/2012FiledMotion to File Document Under Seal (Morton & Vaughn) (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledMotion for leave to amend appellant's brief (Morton) (Appellant)Granted
03/02/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion to File Document Under Seal (Morton & Vaughn) (Appellant) as supplement to the limited appendix of appellant Morton.
03/02/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for leave to amend appellant's brief (Morton) (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
03/02/2012FiledAmended/Corrected Brief (Morton) (Appellant)
03/02/2012FiledSupplemental Limited Appendix of Carl Morton. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Appellant)
03/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
04/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/9/12.
05/09/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/09/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/25/2012FiledReply Brief (Vaughn) (Appellant)
05/30/2012FiledReply Brief (Morton) (Appellant)
05/31/2012FiledMotion for leave to supplement reply brief. (Vaughn) (Appellant)Granted
05/31/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (joint) (Appellant)Granted
06/12/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (joint) (Appellant)
06/12/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for leave to supplement reply brief. (Vaughn) (Appellant)
06/12/2012FiledReply Brief (supplement)(Vaughn) (Appellant)
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (government opposition to motion to suppress)
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/16/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/16/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
08/29/2012FiledOrder Granting aple's unopposed motion to supplement the record.
09/18/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Glickman,Easterly,Pryor,Cory Lee Carlyle Esq.,for appellant Alonzo R. Vaughn. Amamda R. Grier esq.,for appellant Carl S. Morton, Peter S. Smith Esq.,for appellee.
09/25/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #23 (government's exhibit #301-video disk)
09/25/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
09/26/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
10/01/2012FiledLetter (Vaughn) standing by citations previously provided to the Court on 9/25/12. (Appellant)
10/02/2012FiledLetter in response to questions asked during oral argument (Appellant)
04/24/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
06/20/2014FiledOrder Sua Sponte partially vacates order of 3/2/12.
07/03/2014FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Pryor, Senior Judge)
07/24/2014FiledMandate (BOTH)
09/18/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Vaughn) (Appellant)