judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEVEN VS. KRAFT

Case Information: 38355
Short Caption:LEVEN VS. KRAFTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A341853Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David K. Winter--check no. 5762.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14151
08/22/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Removed Wheatherstone Condominium Corp. as a respondent.)
10/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellants have failed to file their docketing statement. Appellants shall within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. We caution appellants that failure to file complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-17634
10/25/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18002
10/25/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18003
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, ' . . . this appeal is dismissed.' The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 01-19433
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.