judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WELLS VS. FORREST

Case Information: 38371
Short Caption:WELLS VS. FORRESTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401081Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2001 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harmon & Shinn, Chtd.--check no. 01522.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14333
08/28/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (No service on notice of appeal.) Due date: 10 days.
09/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/06/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Notice of Appeal and Case Appeal Statement. 01-15080
09/11/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15277
09/13/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
12/07/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-20550
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 01-20984
12/13/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.