judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN THORKILDSEN v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC

Case Heading (S-11-0146)
Case Number:S-11-0146Case Docketed On:06/15/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:JOHN THORKILDSEN v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC
Full Title:JOHN THORKILDSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeMargot BeldenRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeFish Creek Design, LLCRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees
Opinion Number:2012 WY 8
Citation:269 P.3d 421

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/15/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/15/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/02/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/23/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/03/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/04/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - AppelleesNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/17/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/07/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/13/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/10/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal