judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ENRIQUE D. ROBLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0243
Short Caption:ENRIQUE D. ROBLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7841-10Filed Date:02/28/2011

Opening Event Date:02/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:01/18/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEnrique Robles Y
James W. KleinNY
Lee R. GoebesYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. TavanaYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (122pgs/Tape) 1/24/11 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (112pgs/Tape) 1/25/11 proc.
04/11/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (143pgs/Tape) 1/26/11 proc.
04/11/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (102pgs/Tape) 1/28/11 proc.
04/11/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (35pgs/Tape) 2/4/11 proc.
04/11/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (22pgs/Tape) 2/15/11 proc. w/CD
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES
04/21/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (Gov't ex parte motion for leave to disclose info. protected by Superior Court rule 6(e) filed 1/18/11 sealed order Judge Demeo filed 1/19/11) ****SEALED****
05/25/2011 error
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 22, 2011 (no oppo)
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 22, 2011. (By: JAC)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/01/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until November 21, 2011
11/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #8 (9pgs/Tape) 2/15/11 proc. w/CD (missing portion)
11/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 18, 2012
01/18/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/18/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/04/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
04/18/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
04/27/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/04/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
05/04/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
05/15/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Thompson,Farrell, Lee R. Goebles Esq.,for appellant, John P. Tavana Esq.,for appellee.
05/18/2012FiledOrdered that the record is hereby remanded to the Honorable Marisa Demeo to address the aforementioned question. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the supplemental record to this court forthwith. Once the supplemental record is received, it shall be transmitted to this division, which retains jurisdiction of the matter. F/O that this appeal is hereby held in abeyance pending receipt of the supplemental record.
06/21/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #9 (Order of Judge Demeo filed 5/30/12)
08/23/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
09/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. (Appellee)Granted
09/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 10/4/12.
10/04/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellee (pii)Granted in Part/Denied in Part
12/31/2012FiledOrdered that appellant, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
01/16/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a response to the petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
02/25/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a response to the petition and the Clerk shall file the appellant's lodged response to appellee's petition.
02/25/2013FiledOpposition to appellee's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellant)
05/08/2013FiledOrder Granting Petition For Rehearing to the extent that the paragraph beginning with the words " Additionally, the fact that....",........
05/08/2013Filed***Order Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc **AMENDED ON 5/15/13**
05/10/2013FiledNotice Received of typographical error in May 8th order. (Appellant)
05/15/2013FiledAMENDED ORDER denying appellee's petition for rehearing en banc
05/17/2013FiledMandate