judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEPHARDT VS. GEPHARDT

Case Information: 38370
Short Caption:GEPHARDT VS. GEPHARDTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D186766Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2001 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dickerson, Dickerson, Consul & Pocker--check no. 6858.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14325
09/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/11/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15272
09/13/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
11/29/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-20004
12/19/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-21403
01/14/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 19, 2001. To Court Reporter: Family Court Transcript Services. 02-00892
03/04/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-03898
03/08/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 4, 2002. Ms. Ajoub shall file and serve the requested transcripts by March 19, 2002. fn1[All future motions for extensions of time must be accompanied by a proof of service on all parties to the appeal.] 02-04251
03/08/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 19, 2001. Court Reporter: Shelly A. Ajoub. 02-04300
04/18/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-06916
04/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 18, 2002. Appellant shall have until June 17, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We note, however, that this court generally prefers not to delay the processing of appeals due to the informal settlement negotiations of the parties. We therefore caution that no further extension of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-07300
06/18/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 06/18/02. 02-10520
06/18/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 02-10521
07/16/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 60 days requested. 02-12165
07/31/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 16, 2002. Respondent shall have until September 17, 2002, to file and serve the answering brief. 02-13125
09/12/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal, Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 42 (b). 02-15916
10/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-17787
10/15/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.