judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VICTOR EVERETT JACKSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0145)
Case Number:S-11-0145Case Docketed On:06/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:VICTOR EVERETT JACKSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:VICTOR EVERETT JACKSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVictor Everett JacksonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2012 WY 56
Citation:273 P.3d 1105 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/29/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/01/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/15/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2011Correspondence - Incoming other - received copy of letter to district court clerk regarding redactions.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
10/28/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee, brief contains home address. Removed from system and will be refiled.EventPhone CallFinal
10/28/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
04/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal; Waiver of Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/11/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 4/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal