judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GROVE, INC. VS. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 38358
Short Caption:GROVE, INC. VS. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401917Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/05/2001 / Mendoza, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14162
08/21/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14495
08/31/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John Peter Lee--check no. 30227.
08/31/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 01-14790
08/31/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired.
08/31/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. To Appellant/Cross-Respondent Grove, Inc. Due Date: 10 days
09/05/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-14948
09/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 29, 2001. 01-15169
09/18/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 01-15790
09/21/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. John F. Mendoza.
09/25/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Attorney's Fees and Costs. 01-16151
09/26/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. 01-16264
01/28/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-01827
01/28/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-01828
01/28/2002Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 02-01829
02/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Dismissing Appeal and Cross-Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Appellants/cross-respondents' September 25, 2001 motion to dismiss and for attorney fees and costs is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK 02-02629
02/11/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.