judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMASINE QUIGLEY V. POPEYE'S FAMOUS FRIED CHICKEN

Case Information: 11-AA-0231
Short Caption:THOMASINE QUIGLEY V. POPEYE'S FAMOUS FRIED CHICKENClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02768-10Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/16/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerThomasine Quigley YPro SeN
RespondentPopeye's Famous N
Mark E. Papadopoulos NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/01/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/09/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 3, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
03/09/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
04/14/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 9, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
04/27/2011APPEARANCE - of Mark E. Papadopoulos as counsel for the respondent
04/27/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - from respondent's counsel re: case caption
07/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 12/20/10 hearing
07/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/28/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner) (no appendix)
08/30/2011FiledLetter From - respodent notifying the court that a brief will not be filed on behalf of Popeyes Famous Fried Chicken (Respondent)
09/08/2011FiledOrder directing appendix
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File appendix (Petitioner)Granted
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File appendix (Petitioner)
09/28/2011FiledAppendix (attached to motion to late file) (Petitioner)
09/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/16/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Reid
03/02/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
03/26/2012FiledMandate