judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LIBERTY CAB COMPANY v. WILL GREEN

Case: A-4465
A-4465
01/13/1954
Application for Writ of Error
LIBERTY CAB COMPANY
WILL GREEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/28/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/12/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/29/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/23/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/28/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/12/1954Response to Brief filed
01/29/1954Reply to Response
01/23/1954Response to Petition
01/13/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/13/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Will GreenRespondent
Liberty Cab CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information