Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
06/02/2009 | | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
06/25/2009 | | ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 09-CF-627, 09-CF-629, 09-CF-651, 09-CF-652 & 09-CF-679 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Charles E. Mobley in appeal no. 09-CF-627. F/O that Judith A. Lovelace, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Gerald A. Thompkins in appeals nos. 09-CF-652 & 09-CF-679. F/O that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Dante Carpenter in appeals nos. 09-CF-629 & 09-CF-651. F/O that counsel for appellants shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to their appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for their appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (GP) | |
06/25/2009 | | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire in appeal 09-CF-627 | |
06/25/2009 | | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Judith A. Lovelace in appeal no. 09-CF-652 & 09-CF-679. | |
06/30/2009 | | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (09-CF-652 & 09-CF-679 (pii)) (RT ordered/needed (pii)) | |
07/22/2009 | | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (09-CF-629 & 09-CF-651) (RT ordered/needed (pii) | |
09/21/2009 | | APPEARANCE - of Jenifer Wicks as counsel for the aplt (Mobley) | |
12/16/2009 | | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (Mobley) | Granted |
12/29/2009 | | ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant Charles E. Mobley is granted and the appointment of Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire, is hereby vacated. Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to appeal no. 09-CF-627 to newly-retained counsel forthwith. (ETW) | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (83 pgs/Armstrong) 10/14/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (84-143 pgs/Armstrong) 10/15/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (144-159 pgs/Armstrong) 10/16/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8 pgs/Rogers) 10/30/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (164 pgs/Hunt) 11/3/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (360 pgs/Hunt) 11/4-5/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (168 pgs/Allison) 11/6/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (180 pgs/Wood) 11/10/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (62 pgs/Wood) 11/12/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (206 pgs/Maddox) 11/13/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (412 pgs/Jeon) 11/17-20/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (11 pgs/McCarn) 11/24/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (41 pgs/Richer) 11/25/08 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (41 pgs/Price) 1/30/09 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (20 pgs/tape) 5/5/09 proc. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (13 pgs/tape) 5/5/09 proc. p.m. | |
03/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (6 pgs/tape) 6/2/09 proc. w/cd | |
03/23/2010 | | RECORD COPIES (09-CF-627) | |
03/23/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (09-CF-627) | |
03/23/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #18 (Superior Court Pleadings)****SEALED**** | |
03/23/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #19 (21 pgs/Richer - 11/24/08 proc.) | |
03/24/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (09-CF-679) | |
03/24/2010 | | RECORD COPIES (09-CF-679) | |
03/26/2010 | | RECORD COPIES (09-CF-652) | |
03/26/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (09-CF-652) | |
03/26/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 (sealed pleadings) | |
03/30/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (09-CF-651) | |
03/30/2010 | | RECORD COPIES (09-CF-651) | |
03/30/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (pleadings) | |
03/31/2010 | | RECORD COPIES (09-CF-629) | |
03/31/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (09-CF-629) | |
03/31/2010 | | RECORD COMPLETED | |
04/08/2010 | | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP) | |
05/18/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/30/10. (Thompkins) no oppo | |
05/18/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Carpenter) no oppo | |
05/18/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 9/30/10. (Mobley) no oppo | |
05/26/2010 | | On consideration of appellants' unopposed motions for extensions of time within which to file their briefs, it is ORDERED that appellant Charles E. Mobley's motion is granted and appellant Charles E. Mobley's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 30, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Gerald A. Thompkins' motion is granted and appellant Gerald A. Thompkins' brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 30, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Dante Carpenter's motion is granted and apepllant Dante Carpenter's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 16, 2010. (GP) | |
06/30/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/15/10. (Thompkins) no oppo | |
07/02/2010 | | On consideration of appellant Gerald A. Thompkins' unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant Thompkins' brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 15, 2010. No furtherrequests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (JAC) | |
07/15/2010 | | APPELLANT'S BRIEF Thompkins | |
07/15/2010 | | APPENDIX (Thompkin's (pii)) | |
08/16/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (Carpenter) no oppo | |
08/18/2010 | | On consideration of appellant Dante Carpenter's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Carpenter is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 15, 2010. Any further requests for extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief and limited appendix of Charles E. Mobley remains due on or before September 30, 2010. (JAC) | |
09/30/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/31/10. Mobley no oppo | |
10/07/2010 | | On consideration of appellant Charles E. Moble's consent motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant Mobley's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 31, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo) | |
11/15/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (unopposed) (D. Carpenter) dwm | |
11/30/2010 | | On consideration of appellant Dante Carpenter's unopposed motion for an extension of he brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant Dante Carpenter is granted and brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 14, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW) | |
01/03/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Mobley) until 6/13/11 no oppo | |
01/12/2011 | | On consideration of appellant Charles E. Mobley's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Mobley is granted and the brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 13, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW) | |
02/14/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Carpenter) 90 days no oppo | |
02/23/2011 | | On consideration of appellant Dante Carpenter's unopposed motion for an extension of time w/in which to file the brief, andit appearing that this court issued the briefing order on April 8, 2010, and that counsel has repeatedly filed motions for extensions of time, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that appellant Carpenter's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed by May 8, 2011, or counsel shall show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order. It is F/O that the brief and limited appendix of Charles E. Mobley remain due on or before June 3, 2011. (ETW) | |
05/09/2011 | | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Carpenter) | |
05/09/2011 | | APPENDIX | |
06/13/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF & Limited Appendix to July 5, 2011 (no oppo) | |
06/23/2011 | | On consideration of appellant Charles E. Mobley's consent unopposwed motion for an extension of time w/in which to file the brif, and it appearing that this court issued the briefing order on April 8, 2010, and that counsel has repeatedly filed motions for extensions of itme, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the exext that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed by July 5, 2011, or counsel shall show cause why she should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order. (ETW) | |
07/05/2011 | | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Mobley). | |
07/05/2011 | | APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief (Mobley) | |
07/05/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to Join Co-Appellant's Appendicies. | |
07/28/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | |
08/05/2011 | Filed | Order Granting appellant Charles E. Mobley's motion to join co-appellants appendices. | |
08/05/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for extenson to 10/3/11. | |
09/14/2011 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File corrected brief (Appellant) | |
09/23/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Appellant's motion for leave to file the corrected brief | |
09/23/2011 | Filed | Amended/Corrected Brief w/appdx (Appellant) | |
09/28/2011 | Filed | Motion To Remand The Record (Appellee) | |
10/27/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Appellee's motion to the extent that pre-sentencing order denying appellant's motion for new trial vacated, and the appeals are held in abeyance pending further order of this court. | |
11/09/2011 | Filed | Change Of Address Received From (Appellant) | |
01/30/2012 | Filed | Status Report regarding pending (Thompkins) (Appellant) | |
02/03/2012 | Filed | Statement regarding status of trial court proceedings. (Appellant) (Carpenter) | |
05/01/2012 | Filed | Statement regarding status of trial court proceedings. (Carpenter) (Appellant) | |
05/09/2012 | Filed | Notice Received that the motion pending in trial court has been denied 5/4/12. (Thompkins) (Appellant) | |
05/18/2012 | Filed | Statement regarding trial court proceeding advising this Court that on May 4, 2012 appellant's motion for new trial was denied (Carpenter) (Appellant) | |
06/12/2012 | Filed | Proceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed | |
06/12/2012 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals 12-CO-621, 12-CO-656. 12-CO-657, 12-CO-710 & 12-CO-717 with previously consolidated appeals 09-CF-627, 09-CF-629. 09-CF-651, 09-CF-652 & 09-CF-679 and directing Statement Regarding Transcript. | |
06/20/2012 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant, Thompkins 12-CO-656) | |
06/26/2012 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant, Carpenter) | |
07/11/2012 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (12-CO-621) (Appellant) | |
08/09/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #22 (14pgs/Tape) 11/29/11 proc. | |
08/09/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #23 (16pgs/Tape) 2/24/12 proc. | |
08/09/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #24 (76pgs/Lindsay) 3/23/12 proc. | |
08/09/2012 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #25 (4pgs/Tape) 5/4/12 proc. w/CD | |
08/09/2012 | Filed | Record Completed | |
08/16/2012 | Filed | Briefing Order in appeals nos. 12-CO-621, 12-CO-656, 12-CO-657, 12-CO-710 & 12-CO-717 | |
08/22/2012 | Filed | Record Copies (12-CO-717) | |
08/22/2012 | Filed | Record Index(12-CO-717) | |
08/23/2012 | Filed | Record Copies (12-CO-710) | |
08/23/2012 | Filed | Record Index (12-CO-710) | |
09/21/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Carpenter) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
09/24/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Thompkins) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
09/25/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Mobley) (Appellant) | Granted |
10/02/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Mobley) (Appellant) to 2/22/13
Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Thompkins) Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 12/28/12
Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Carpenter) Appendix, Brief (Appellant to 12/24/12 | |
12/06/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Carpenter) (Appellant) | Granted |
12/18/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Carpenter) (Appellant) in appeal nos. 12-CO-710 & 12-CO-717 on or before 3/24/13 | |
12/28/2012 | Filed | Brief (12-CO-656 Thompkins) (Appellant) | |
12/28/2012 | Filed | Appendix (12-CO-656 Thompkins) (Attached to brief) (Appellant) | |
02/22/2013 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant Mobley) | |
03/07/2013 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant Mobley) in appeal no. 12-CO-621 on or before 4/26/12. | |
03/22/2013 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Carpenter) (Appellant) | |
04/09/2013 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Carpenter) (Appellant) in appeals nos. 12-CO-710 and 12-CO-717, SS that appeals nos. 12-CO-710 and 12-CO-717 are hereby severed from these appeals, and appellant Mobley's brief and limited appendix remain due on or before April 26, 2013. | |
04/26/2013 | Filed | Brief (Mobley) (Appellant) | |
04/26/2013 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | |
05/31/2013 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | |
05/31/2013 | Filed | Briefing Completed | |
06/12/2013 | Filed | Record Copies(12-CO-657) | |
06/12/2013 | Filed | Record Index(12-CO-657) | |
06/13/2013 | Filed | Record Copies (12-CO-621) | |
06/13/2013 | Filed | Record Index (12-CO-621) | |
06/13/2013 | Filed | Record Copies(12-CO-656) | |
06/13/2013 | Filed | Record Index(12-CO-656) | |
06/24/2013 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | |
06/24/2013 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | |
06/25/2013 | Filed | Reply Brief (Thompkins) (Appellant) | |
11/01/2013 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | |
11/22/2013 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File (Mobley) Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
11/22/2013 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File(Carpenter) Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted |
12/02/2013 | Filed | Order Granting aplt's Carpenter to file reply brief. | |
12/02/2013 | Filed | Reply Brief (Carpenter) (Appellant) | |
12/02/2013 | Filed | Order Granting aplt Mobley's motion to file reply brief. | |
12/02/2013 | Filed | Reply Brief (Mobley) (Appellant) | |
12/06/2013 | Filed | Argued before Chief Judge Washington, Associate Judge Thompson, and Senior Judge Reid. (Jenifer Wicks, Esq. for appellant Charles E. Mobley) (Judith A. Lovelace, Esq. for appellant Gerald A. Thompkins) (Shilpa S. Satoskar, Esq. for appellant Dante Carpenter) (David B. Goodhand, Esq. for appellee) | |
10/16/2014 | Filed | Affirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge; Thompson, Associate Judge; and Reid, Senior Judge) | |
10/22/2014 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Thompkins) (Appellant) | |
10/29/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Carpenter) (Appellant) | Granted |
10/30/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to December 30, 2014. (CARPENTER) | |
10/30/2014 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Mobley) (Appellant) | |
12/03/2014 | Filed | Letter From Pro Se Appellant in hopes of getting his resentencing expedited (Appellant-Thompkins) | |
12/19/2014 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) | |
01/09/2015 | Filed | Ordered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (CARPENTER) | |
01/09/2015 | Filed | Mandate (CARPENTER- 09-CF-651) | |
03/19/2015 | Filed | Order Denying appellant Mobley's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. | |
04/06/2015 | Filed | Motion To Stay Issuance Of The Mandate pending resolution of Certiorari in the direct criminal appeal (Mobley) (Appellant) | Granted |
04/07/2015 | Filed | Order Granting aplt's motion to stay mandate. | |
06/17/2015 | Filed | Notice Received of petition for writ of certiorari (Appellant) Mobley | |
06/24/2015 | Filed | Copy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant- Mobley) | |
10/08/2015 | Filed | Notice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant) | |