judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HHF, INC. VS. BRZICA

Case Information: 38357
Short Caption:HHF, INC. VS. BRZICACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A398748Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nik Skrinjaric--check no. 2045.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14161
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/07/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15090
09/12/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
01/30/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-01992
02/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-03536
04/02/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-05867
04/26/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Appellants may seek to recover any deposits, fees or cash bonds in district court.] SNP/CLK 02-07390
04/26/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.