judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN R. KRUGER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0133)
Case Number:S-11-0133Case Docketed On:05/20/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN R. KRUGER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN R. KRUGER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven R. KrugerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2012 WY 2
Citation:268 P.3d 248

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/07/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/23/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/14/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/14/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Documents.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/26/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal