judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS TYRELL BUNN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0236
Short Caption:CURTIS TYRELL BUNN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-11836-09Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:05/23/2013
Argued/Submitted:11/26/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/06/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis Tyrell Bunn Y
Shilpa S. SatoskarNY
Peter H. MeyersYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/30/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (11 pgs/Armstrong) 10/25/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (66 pgs/White) 10/27/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (124 pgs/Richer) 10/29/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (140 pgs/Armstrong) 11/3/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (141-200 pgs/Armstrong) 11/5/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (226 pgs/Richer) 11/8/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (227-431 pgs/Richer) 11/10/10 prov
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (432-694 pgs/Richer) 11/16/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (695-940 pgs/Richer) 11/17/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (941-1151 pgs/Richer) 11/18/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (1152-1396 pgs/Richer) 11/19/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (1397-1425 pgs/Richer) 11/22/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (22 pgs/Davis) 11/29-30/10 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (22 pgs/White) 2/2/11 proc. w/cd
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index
08/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (SEALED pleadings)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 1/3/12.
12/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motionf or extension to 4/2/12.
03/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
03/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 7/2/12.
06/15/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw and for appointment of new counsel (Appellant)Granted
06/26/2012FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Counsel's Motion To Withdraw and for appointment of new counsel (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Peter H. Meyers, Esquire (Appellant)
09/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 26, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
10/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 26, 2012 (Appellant)
11/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until Jan 25, 2013 (Appellant)Granted
12/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until Jan 25, 2013 (Appellant)
01/18/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/18/2013FiledAppendix (appellant)
02/21/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/07/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 4/23/13
04/23/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/26/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/23/13
05/20/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (105 pgs/Armstrong) 11/2/10 proc.
05/23/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/23/2013FiledBriefing Completed
06/19/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/19/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
06/28/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/01/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/08/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
10/08/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/26/2013FiledArgued Before Asscoiate Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Senior Judge Steadman. (Peter H. Myers for appellant) (Anne Y. Park for appellee).
12/23/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges; and Steadman, Senior Judge)
12/31/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/25/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
03/06/2014FiledMandate
04/07/2014FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
05/06/2014FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/07/2015FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel to file Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)Denied
10/20/2015FiledOrder Denying Motion To Appoint Counsel to file Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)