judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEEGAN (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38360
Short Caption:MEEGAN (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29511 , 29739 , 32191 , 35811 , 37277 , 38054 , 38129 , 39442 , 40983 , 46028 , 47610 , 48152 , 48173 , 49373 , 50288 , 57447
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135497Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/22/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14248
09/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. On June 28, 2001, appellant filed a notice of appeal from the June 6, 2001 order that was docketed in this court in Docket No. 38129. On August 17, 2001, appellant filed a second notice of appeal from the June 6, 2001 order that was docketed in this court in Docket No. 38360. Thus, two separate cases were inadvertently opened in this court under Docket Nos. 38129 and 38360. " We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 38360." The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 38129 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 38360. Appellant's appeal from the denial of his motion will proceed under Docket No. 38129. This order does not affect the portion of this court's July 24, 2001 order filed in Docket No. 38129 directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the trial court record within one hundred and twenty days. Nos. 38129/38360-these cases are not consolidated. 01-16337
09/27/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. Administratively closed. No remittitur issued.