judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VINCENT ROSTY v. SHARI SKAJ and STEVE SKAJ

Case Heading (S-11-0136)
Parent: S-11-0063 Case Docketed On:05/31/2011
Consolidated:S-11-0136
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:VINCENT ROSTY v. SHARI SKAJ and STEVE SKAJ
Full Title:VINCENT ROSTY, Appellant (Defendant), v. SHARI SKAJ and STEVE SKAJ, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVincent RostyHampton K. O'Neill
Timothy M. Stubson
AppelleeShari SkajTimothy W. Miller
Robert Todd Ingram
AppelleeSteve SkajTimothy W. Miller
Robert Todd Ingram

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/31/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/31/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/31/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/01/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/03/2011Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to ConsolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2011Response/Objection - Motion to consolidate.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Opposition to Motion to ConsolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/13/2011Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opposition to Appellee's (sic) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/16/2011Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
06/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss For Lack of JurisdictionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Order - Denying, Without Prejudice, Motion to Dismiss and Order Granting Motion to ConsolidateOrderDenyFinal
07/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Response BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/26/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court clerkNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/03/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Timothy M. Stubson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - R. Todd Ingram for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/08/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Timothy M. Stubson for appellant; Robert Todd Ingram for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of addressNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Change of Address for Counsel for Appellant Vincent RostyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/08/2012Event - Phone Call - Send copy of mandate to Federal District Court in CasperEventPhone CallFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/19/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/15/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal