judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES I. ELEGALAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0237
Short Caption:CHARLES I. ELEGALAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-29610-08Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/27/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/07/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles I. ElegalamY
Khadijah R. AliYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Harry B. Roback YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/motion for appeal transcript attached (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (61 pgs/McCarn) 1/6/09 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (8 pgs/Richer) 7/1/09 proc
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (5 pgs/tape) 9/30/09 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (9 pgs/Hunt) 1/13/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (5 pgs/tape) 2/2/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (8 pgs/McCarn) 2/23/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (10 pgs/Hunt) 5/10/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (9 pgs/Hunt) 6/15/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (11 pgs/Richer) 7/1/10 proc
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (10 pgs/tape) 7/16/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (113 pgs/Armstrong) 10/25/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (114-307 pgs/Armstrong) 10/27/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (308-422 pgs/Armstrong) 10/28/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (423-591 pgs/Burr) 11/1/10 proc
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (592-671 pgs/Armstrong) 11/2/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (672-700 pgs/Armstrong) 11/3/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (701-720 pgs/Armstrong) 11/4/10 proc.
08/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (19 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 2/1/11 proc. w/cd
08/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (SEALED pleading)
08/26/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/26/2011FiledRecord Index
09/06/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 12/17/11.
10/31/2011FiledMotion to Substitute Counsel. (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Withdraw Appointed Counsel
11/30/2011FiledBriefing Order (see 11/30/11 order)
01/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
01/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting motion of appellant to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/9/12.
03/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
05/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/31/12
06/04/2012FiledMotion for leave to late file brief and appendix (Appellant)Granted
06/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for leave to late file brief and appendix (Appellant)
06/08/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
06/08/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/22/2012FiledMotion for leave to amend brief (Appellant)Granted
06/27/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For for leave to file amended brief (Appellant)
06/27/2012FiledBrief (amended) (Appellant)
07/27/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/27/2012FiledBriefing Completed
07/27/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
08/10/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/30/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (government exhibit 92)
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/07/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, King
04/12/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge)
05/07/2013FiledMandate