judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MITCHELL (JOHNNIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38359
Short Caption:MITCHELL (JOHNNIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45341
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C120775Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/07/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/22/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14245
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38065/38267/38293/38311/38333/38359. 01-17804
01/07/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 02-00359
01/07/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn28 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-11926
08/06/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-12040
08/06/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2002. 02-12040