judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEONARD VS. ISAACS

Case Information: 38367
Short Caption:LEONARD VS. ISAACSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37516
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382571Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/05/2001 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Sullivan, Hill, Lewin, Rez & Engel, APLC--check no. 31402.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14306
09/05/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/10/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15239
09/12/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Persi J. Mishel.
01/28/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 15, 2002. 02-01854
02/25/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-03490
02/25/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-03491
03/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-04308
03/11/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.