judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILAGRO MOREJON V. DC DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REGLATORY AFFAIRS

Case Information: 11-AA-0232
Short Caption:MILAGRO MOREJON V. DC DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REGLATORY AFFAIRSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Regulatory Affairs
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DCRA00136-10Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/05/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMilagro MorejonNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECEIVED ONLY)
03/01/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/09/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
03/29/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/29/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
04/20/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
04/20/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
04/21/2011WithdrawnMANDATE ISSUED
05/20/2011FiledMANDATE RECALLED
05/20/2011ORDER GRANT PETITIONER MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and the mandate issued by this court on April 21, 2011 is hereby recalled. It is (MORE)
05/20/2011 F/O that the Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
09/12/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
09/12/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/15/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
12/14/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
12/14/2011FiledDismissed
01/05/2012FiledMandate