judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. LISENBEE

Case Information: 32635
Short Caption:STATE VS. LISENBEECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR973978Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/29/2000 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/29/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.)
07/02/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr.
07/24/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
09/01/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned.
12/01/1998Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Counsel for respondent has not responded to our order of September 1, 1998. We conclude that sanctions should be imposed in the amount of $250.00. Counsel for respondent shall personally pay the sum to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of said payment within 20 days of the date of this order. Counsel shall file and serve the fast track response for this appeal within 10 days, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned further. (Order mailed to counsel for respondent by regular and certified mail).
12/10/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
12/10/1998Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Received proof of payment from Supreme Court Library in the amount of $250.00.
12/30/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Respondent.
03/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Respondent's counsel has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent. We grant attorney Forgeron's motion to withdraw. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for respondent. If indigent the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, respondent retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to this court a copy of the district court order and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on respondent's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with this court. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 60 days after the date that counsel enters an appearance with this court. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31.
03/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order substituting counsel filed in the district court on February 12, 1999.
03/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order substituting counsel following remand filed in the district court on March 18, 1999.
03/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Jack T. Bullock, II.
04/23/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/22/99.
04/23/1999Other Other. Returned, unfiled with letter: the original and one copy of the Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
05/24/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 5/21/99.
01/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Requesting Supplemental Briefing. Appellant and respondent shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file supplemental briefs. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed 10 pages and shall address the impact of Illinois v. Wardlow, 528 U.S. ___ (January 12, 2000). The clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for argument before the en banc court in March 2000 for thirty (30) minutes. (Order mailed to counsel with a copy of the Illinois v. Wardlow decision of January 12, 2000 attached).
02/01/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. 00-01610
02/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for March 29, 2000 at the hour of 9:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (En Banc) 00-01634
02/14/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Answering Brief (Lisenbee). Mailed on: 2/12/00. 00-02273
03/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-04094
03/29/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB
12/05/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Leavitt, J. We concur: Agosti, J. and Becker, J. Maupin, J., with whom Shearing, J., agrees, concurring. Young, J., with whom Rose, C.J., agrees, dissenting. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 117. En Banc. 00-21175
12/21/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 12/20/00-USPS Express Mail. 00-22268
06/06/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB 01-09385
06/22/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-09444
06/22/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 25, 2001. 01-09444