judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK J. GARNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0119)
Case Number:S-11-0119Case Docketed On:05/10/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MARK J. GARNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARK J. GARNER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark J. GarnerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 156
Citation:264 P.3d 811

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/10/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/24/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/27/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/06/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/22/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/14/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volumes IV-VIII, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/16/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/02/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/02/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/05/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal