judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES M. PATOCK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0217
Short Caption:JAMES M. PATOCK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-20876-10Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/16/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/11/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames M. Patock Y
Mindy A. DanielsNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela G. Schmidt NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire
04/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
04/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (22 pgs/tape) 12/20/10 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX
05/03/2011RECORD COPIES
05/03/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the pro se letter from appellant received on April 20,2011. (TBN)
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (12 pgs/tape) 11/4/10 proc.
09/08/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledLetter From - the aplt regarding the appointment of Minday Daniels as counsel for his appeal (Appellant)
09/16/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the Sept. 12 pro se letter received from appellant.
02/29/2012LodgedLetter requesting that court-appointed counsel be removed,request to obtain Transcripts and to add grounds for dismissal of charges due to lack of probable cause...From (Appellant)
03/06/2012FiledLetter To Court Appointed Counsel regarding letter received and previously referred mailed in September 2011.
03/16/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (76 pgs/tape) 11/5/10 proc. w/cd
03/16/2012FiledRecord Completed
03/30/2012FiledLetter From (Appellant) in response to letter 3/6/12
05/17/2012FiledBriefing Order
07/10/2012FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave, w/n 20 days.
07/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/20/12
08/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 9/30/12
10/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET on or before 11/26/12.
12/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 12/31/12
01/10/2013FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion wn 15 days.
01/30/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/01/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days
02/01/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/01/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/28/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until April 4, 2013 (Appellee)Granted
03/12/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until April 4, 2013 (Appellee)
03/27/2013FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
04/01/2013FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/02/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
05/20/2013FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE the lodged OPPOSITION and GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/20/2013FiledOpposition (Appellant)
05/20/2013FiledAffirmed
05/29/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
06/11/2013FiledMandate