judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERBERTA JOHNSON v. CRESTVIEW ESTATES IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-11-0137)
Case Number:S-11-0137Case Docketed On:06/01/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:HERBERTA JOHNSON v. CRESTVIEW ESTATES IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Full Title:HERBERTA JOHNSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. CRESTVIEW ESTATES IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHerberta Johnson Pro Se
AppelleeCrestview Estates Improvement DistrictJames L. Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/01/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/12/2011Brief - Appellant (Brief does not appear to have been served on Counsel for Appellee)(medical records in brief not scanned as they contain unredacted information)BriefAppellantFinal
07/20/2011Event - Phone Call from Appellant re letter from opposing counsel re dismissal of appeal by Supreme Court. Advised her no order has been entered dismissing.EventPhone CallFinal
07/26/2011Correspondence - Incoming, letter from Appellee to AppellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/01/2011Event - Phone Call from Appellant, she delivered copy of Brief to Courthouse, placed in Appellee's mailbox on July 11, 2011.EventPhone CallFinal
08/08/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Appellant's Brief from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/09/2011Order - Affirming the District Court's "Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings"OrderOtherFinal
08/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/11/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Decision letter by District JudgeRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesDecision letterFinal
08/15/2011Event - Phone Call from Appellant re affirmance. Requested return of original papers, will send when mandate issues.EventPhone CallFinal
08/18/2011Motion - Stay - of Any Warrant for Search and Seizer (sic), Plus Harassment and ThreatsMotionStay - otherFinal
08/31/2011Order - Denying Motion for StayOrderDenyFinal
08/31/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/31/2011Event - Case closed (pleadings returned to Ms. Johnson per request)EventCase closedFinal