judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INGMAR GUANDIQUE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0239
Short Caption:INGMAR GUANDIQUE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-9230-09Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/05/2015
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIngmar Guandique Y
James W. KleinNY
Jonathan W. Anderson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (11p gs/Gilliam) 5/27/09 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (22 pgs/tape) 7/31/09 proc
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (36 pgs/Hunt) 10/16/09 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (38 pgs/Janifer) 10/23/09 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (19 pgs/tape) 10/30/09 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (17 pgs/tape) 11/23/09 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (5 pgs/tape) 12/15/09 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (81 pgs/Hawkins) 1/29/10 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (65 pgs/Hill) 5/14/10 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (27 pgs/Hawkins) 6/14/10 proc
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (43 pgs/Johnson) 6/24/10 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (81 pgs/Ramos) 7/16/10 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (70 pgs/Davis) 8/20/10 proc.
09/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (117 pgs/Davis) 9/10/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (99 pgs/Richer) 9/22/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (55 pgs/Richer) 9/27/10 proc
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (81 pgs/Richer) 10/8/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (82 pgs/McCarn) 10/14/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (209 pgs/McCarn) 10/18/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (18 pgs/Wood) 10/19/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (217 pgs/Wood) 10/20/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (117 pgs/McCarn) 10/21/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #23 (8 pgs/tape) 10/21/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #24 (52 pgs/McCarn) 10/22/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (213 pgs/Wood) 10/25/10 proc
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #26 (117 pgs/McCarn) 10/26/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #27 (112 pgs/Wood) 10/26/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #28 (128 pgs/Wood) 10/27/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #29 (97 pgs/McCarn) 10/27/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #30 (122 pgs/McCarn) 10/28/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #31 (91 pgs/Wood) 10/28/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #32 (135 pgs/Wood) 11/1/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #33 (114 pgs/McCarn) 11/1/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #34 (127 pgs/Wood) 11/2/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #35 (115 pgs/McCarn) 11/2/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #36 (84 pgs/Wood) 11/3/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #37 (143 pgs/McCarn) 11/3/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #38 (152 pgs/McCarn) 11/4/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #39 (23 pgs/Wood) 11/4/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #40 (215 pgs/Burr) 11/10/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #41 (92 pgs/Burr) 11/12/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #42 (167 pgs/Walker) 11/15/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #43 (182 pgs/Walker) 11/16/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #44 (113 pgs/Walker) 11/17/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #45 (21 pgs/Walker) 11/19/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #46 (10 pgs/Maar) 11/22/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #47 (25 pgs/Maar) 11/24/10 proc.
09/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #48 (64 pgs/Maddox) 2/11/11 proc. w/cd
09/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #49 (SEALED documents)
09/30/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/30/2011FiledRecord Index
09/30/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to March 6, 2012.
02/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 6/4/12.
05/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 9/13/12.
09/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until December 11,2012 (Appellant)Granted
09/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting to the extent that the Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) is due by 11/28/12.
11/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/26/12
01/14/2013FiledOrder Granting motion to file a motion to stay appeal under seal.
01/14/2013FiledMotion To Stay Appeal pending completion of Superior Court proceedings and request to place instant motion under seal (Appellee)
01/14/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal pending further order of this court.
03/15/2013FiledStatus Report regarding pending (Appellant)
06/13/2013FiledStatement regarding status of trial Court proceedings. (Appellant)
07/10/2013FiledAnswer/Response to appellant's 6/13/13 status report. (Appellee)
08/12/2013FiledStatus Report regarding pending trial court proceedings (Appellant)
11/08/2013FiledStatus Report regarding pending Superior Court proceeding. (Appellant)
01/07/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending trial Court proceeding (Appellant)
03/10/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending Superior Court proceeding (Appellant)
05/09/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending trial Court proceeding (Appellant)
07/22/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending trial Court proceedings (Appellant)
09/19/2014FiledStatus Report regarding pending trial Court proceedings (Appellant)
11/18/2014FiledStatus Report regarding trial court proceeding (Appellant)
01/16/2015FiledStatus Report regarding pending Status regarding trial court proceeding (Appellant) (Appellant)
03/17/2015FiledStatus Report regarding pending Superior Court proceeding (Appellant)
05/15/2015FiledStatus Report regarding pending Superior Court proceeding. (Appellant)
06/04/2015FiledMotion To Remand (Appellant)Granted
06/05/2015FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND and DISMISSING THIS APPEAL and REMANDING TO SUPERIOR COURT and F/O DIRECTING ******THE CLERK TO ISSUE THE MANDATE FORTHWITH
06/05/2015FiledDISMISSED and REMANDED
06/05/2015FiledMandate