judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY AND OTHERS, GREAT WESTERN SUGAR COMPANY, ET AL. (BEET SUGAR APELLANTS), CALIFORNIA AND HAWAIIAN SUGAR REFINING CORPORATION, LTD. AND GODCHAUX SUGARS, INC., AMERICAN SUGAR REFINING COMPANY, TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAIL v. RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, IMPERIAL SUGAR COMPANY, CORN PRODUCTS REFINING COMPANY, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-4463
A-4463
01/12/1954
Direct Appeal
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY AND OTHERS, GREAT WESTERN SUGAR COMPANY, ET AL. (BEET SUGAR APELLANTS), CALIFORNIA AND HAWAIIAN SUGAR REFINING CORPORATION, LTD. AND GODCHAUX SUGARS, INC., AMERICAN SUGAR REFINING COMPANY, TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAIL
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, IMPERIAL SUGAR COMPANY, CORN PRODUCTS REFINING COMPANY, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/03/1956Response to Brief filed
12/22/1955Brief in Support of Petition
12/01/1955Motion for Rehearing
11/30/1955Motion for Rehearing
10/28/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/22/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/12/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/05/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/05/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/29/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/28/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/28/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/20/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/16/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/13/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/11/1955Motion for Rehearing
08/11/1955Motion for Rehearing
08/11/1955Motion for Rehearing
08/05/1955Motion for Rehearing
10/26/1954Response to Reply filed
10/19/1954Reply to Response
10/04/1954Response to Brief filed
09/01/1954Response to Brief filed
09/01/1954Appellees' Brief filed
08/27/1954Appellees' Brief filed
07/14/1954Appellant's Brief filed
06/29/1954Appellant's Brief filed
06/29/1954Appellant's Brief filed
06/29/1954Direct Appeal filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1956Response to Brief filed
12/22/1955Brief in Support of Petition
12/01/1955Motion for Rehearing
11/30/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/28/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/22/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/12/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/05/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/05/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/03/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/30/1955Response to Motion filed
09/29/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/28/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/28/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/20/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/16/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/13/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/24/1955Additional Copies received
08/11/1955Motion for Rehearing
08/11/1955Motion for Rehearing
08/11/1955Motion for Rehearing
08/05/1955Motion for Rehearing
07/27/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
07/27/1955Concurring Opinion issued.
07/27/1955Opinion issued
10/26/1954Response to Reply filed
10/19/1954Reply to Response
10/04/1954Response to Brief filed
09/01/1954Response to Brief filed
09/01/1954Appellees' Brief filed
08/27/1954Appellees' Brief filed
08/26/1954Notice of rehearing, etc.
08/05/1954Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
07/14/1954Appellant's Brief filed
06/29/1954Appellant's Brief filed
06/29/1954Appellant's Brief filed
06/29/1954Direct Appeal filed
06/17/1954Letter Filed
04/30/1954Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/30/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/05/1954Motion for Extension of Time filedFiling granted
01/12/1954Motion for Extension of Time filedFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles L. BlackAmicus Curiae
Texas Telephone AssociationAmicus Curiae
Texas and New Orleans Railroad Company, et al.Appellant
Great Western Sugar Company, et al. (Beet Sugar Apellants)Appellant
LONE STAR GAS COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Appellee
Ira ButlerAmicus Curiae
Robert E. HardwickeAmicus Curiae
Houston Natural Gas CorporationAmicus Curiae
United Gas CorporationAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellee
Texas and New Orleans Railroad Company and OthersAppellant
Bennett L. SmithAmicus Curiae
American Sugar Refining CompanyAppellant
Imperial Sugar CompanyAppellee
California and Hawaiian Sugar Refining Corporation, Ltd. and Godchaux Sugars, Inc.Appellant
Joseph M. StuhlAmicus Curiae
Lennart V. LarsonAmicus Curiae
Central Power and Light CompanyAmicus Curiae
Tarlton MorrowAmicus Curiae
A. J. FolleyAmicus Curiae
D. H. CultonAmicus Curiae
Gillis A. JohnsonAmicus Curiae
Corn Products Refining CompanyAppellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information