judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRISS VS. STATE, DEPT. OF PRISONS

Case Information: 38354
Short Caption:CRISS VS. STATE, DEPT. OF PRISONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0100299AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2001 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Jeffrey A. Dickerson--check no. 6808.
08/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14147
08/24/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/27/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Michael D. Jensen, Deputy Attorney General, is not counsel of record in this case. 01-14526
09/12/2001Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. Called for a motion to file late. 01-15432
11/07/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18605
11/07/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18606
11/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 12, 2001, appellant submitted an untimely docketing statement. On this same date, the clerk of this court notified appellant to file a motion to file an untimely docketing statement. To date appellant ha failed to file the motion. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we direct the clerk of this court to file the untimely docketing statement. Any future violations of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure may result in the imposition of sanctions. 01-18816
11/13/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15432
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, ' . . . this appeal is dismissed.' The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 01-19431
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.