judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUFUS ALLISON V. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST

Case Information: 11-CV-0226
Short Caption:RUFUS ALLISON V. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUSTClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB34921-09Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/20/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRufus Allison NPro SeN
AppelleeDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, As TrusteeN
Matthew M. MooreNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/15/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW HOW HE IS AGGRIEVED by the 2/22/11 order and why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF STANDING, in light of this court's disposition in appeal 10CV513... (BY: ETW)
03/15/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - appellant's motion for sanctions
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (26-pgs/tape 2/22/10 proc.) (*ordered by aplt R. Allison) (elp)
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (8-pgs/tape 5/17/10 proc.)w/cd (*ordered by aplt R. Allison) (elp)
03/18/2011RECORD INDEX
03/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/22/11) (elp)
04/03/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - (titled as motion to appeal from a judgment or order of a superior court)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to sanction aple.
04/28/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as appellant is NOT AGGRIEVED and lacks standing because the affirmed judgment of possession determined that appellant has no legal right to the subject property... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS HEREBY DENIED... (THKNTE)
04/28/2011DISMISSED
05/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED
07/07/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and to convene appeal conference to discuss settlement
07/26/2011FiledOrder Denying APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and to convene appeal conference to discuss settlement