judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSHUA JORGEN HANSON v. MELANIE SMITH BELVEAL, f/n/a MELANIE ANN HANSON

Case Heading (S-11-0130)
Case Number:S-11-0130Case Docketed On:05/18/2011
Linked To: S-11-0131
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JOSHUA JORGEN HANSON v. MELANIE SMITH BELVEAL, f/n/a MELANIE ANN HANSON
Full Title:JOSHUA JORGEN HANSON, Appellant (Petitioner/Plaintiff), v. MELANIE SMITH BELVEAL, f/n/a MELANIE ANN HANSON, Appellee (Respondent/Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoshua Jorgen HansonElizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons
AppelleeMelanie Smith BelvealSky D Phifer
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 98
Citation:280 P.3d 1186

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/18/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/18/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (amended - new attorney)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/05/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received Appellant's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/29/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/29/2011Service - Amended Certificate of Service - reply brief of appellant.ServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
08/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant (with amended certificate of service attached).EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/06/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/16/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/19/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
07/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's FeesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2012Order - Denying Motion for Attorney FeesOrderDenyFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/29/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/29/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/4/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal