judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLORIA N. MITCHELL V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0227
Short Caption:GLORIA N. MITCHELL V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB202-10Filed Date:02/28/2011

Opening Event Date:02/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGloria N. Mitchell N
Richard J. LinkYN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/05/2000 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 6, 2011. (dlm)
02/28/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
02/28/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/01/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. and Gregory Lamb, Esq.
05/20/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
05/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/30/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo).
07/21/2011FiledOrder Granting PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/28/11.
07/28/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
07/28/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
08/02/2011FiledOrder directing petitioner to submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file.
09/01/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
09/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/29/2011FiledLetter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Petitioner)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/27/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Beckwith,Belson Richard J.Link Esq.,for Petitioner Richard S.Love Esq.,for Respondent
06/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
07/12/2012FiledMotion To Publish (Respondent)Granted
08/30/2012FiledORDERED that the motion is granted and the Clerk is directed to cause the decision to be published.
08/30/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges;Belson, Senior Judge.)
09/21/2012FiledMandate