judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRONTIER INSURANCE VS. EMERALD TRUST

Case Information: 38366
Short Caption:FRONTIER INSURANCE VS. EMERALD TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A418192Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen Nelson & Sanders--check no. 31856.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14299
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (Amended) Filed in district court on: August 23, 2001. 01-14504
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (Errata to Frontier Insurance Company's Case Appeal Statement) Filed in district court on: August 23, 2001. 01-14505
09/11/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15279
09/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-15712
09/19/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent Emerald Trust, Utd, 8/12/92's Motion to Dismiss Frontier Insurance Company's Appeal. 01-15851
09/26/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellant Frontier Insurance Company's Motion to Stay Appeal and Opposition to Emerald Trust, UTD, 8/12/92's Motion to Dismiss. 01-16240
09/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Law firm of Berkley, Gordon, Levine, Goldstein & Garfinkel in place and stead of Jimmerson Hanson as counsel for respondent Emerald Trust. 01-16361
10/10/2001Other Other. Respondent Emerald Trust, Utd., 8/12/92's Reply to Appellant's Opposition and Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Stay Appeal. 01-17084
11/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order of Stay of Proceedings and Injunction Against Actions, Lawsuits and Proceedings Against Frontier Insurance Company. 01-18399
11/08/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Amended Notice of Entry of Order of Stay of Proceedings and Injunction Against Actions, Lawsuits and Proceedings Agaisnt Frontier Insurance Company. 01-18674
05/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondent Emerald Trust has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant Frontier Insurance Company has filed an opposition. We grant the motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction." fn6[Having determined that we lack jurisdiction, we deny appellant Frontier Insurance Company's motion for a stay. In addition, we deny respondent Emerald Trust's request for attorney fees for having to bring the motion to dismiss.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-08186
06/04/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08341
06/04/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/17/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 11, 2002. 02-08341