judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CONTINENTAL BUS SYSTEM, INC. AND TRANSCONTINENTAL BUS SYSTEM, INC., UNION BUS LINES, INC. v. RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-4456
A-4456
01/08/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CONTINENTAL BUS SYSTEM, INC. AND TRANSCONTINENTAL BUS SYSTEM, INC., UNION BUS LINES, INC.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/19/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/06/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/03/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/25/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/19/1954Brief in Support of Petition
05/06/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/03/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/25/1954Response to Petition
01/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Union Bus Lines, Inc.Petitioner
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
Continental Bus System, Inc. and Transcontinental Bus System, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information