judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GIANT OF MARYLAND, LLC V. FREDERICK L. ROBINSON

Case Information: 11-AA-0233
Short Caption:GIANT OF MARYLAND, LLC V. FREDERICK L. ROBINSONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00014-11Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGiant of MarylandNPro SeN
RespondentFrederick L. Robinson NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/01/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/01/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review filed with this court on March 3, 2011, from an order entered by the Office of Administrative Hearings on February 16, 2011, and it appearing that that petitioner has failed to attach a copy of the order being appealed with the petition for review, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall submit a copy of the order on appeal within 15 days from the date of this order. It is (MORE)
03/18/2011 ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
04/22/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
04/22/2011DISMISSED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED