judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANDONICOLAS (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38365
Short Caption:LANDONICOLAS (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173126Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14292
08/24/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. Filed in district court on: August 17, 2001. 01-14380
09/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 01-15145
09/18/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/2101 ending 5/25/01. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. Filed in district court on: September 11, 2001. 01-15769
09/27/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-16342
09/27/2001Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 01-16343
09/27/2001AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. 01-16344
09/28/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 22, 2001. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 01-16377
10/15/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 27, 2001. The clerk shall file the 13 page fast track, statement and appendix received on September 27, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-17316
10/15/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16343
10/15/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16344
10/17/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17545
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part and Remanding to Correct Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20926
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00234
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00234