judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ALAMO CASUALTY COMPANY v. HELEN L. RIZK, ET VIR

Case: A-4479
A-4479
01/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ALAMO CASUALTY COMPANY
HELEN L. RIZK, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/24/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/01/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
01/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/27/1954Response to Motion filed
03/24/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/01/1954Reply to Response
01/27/1954Response to Petition
01/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alamo Casualty CompanyPetitioner
Helen L. Rizk, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information