judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT A. DAVENPORT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0121)
Case Number:S-11-0121Case Docketed On:05/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:SCOTT A. DAVENPORT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:SCOTT A. DAVENPORT, Appellant (Petitioner/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott A. DavenportGeorge Santini
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry
John D. Rossetti

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 6
Citation:268 P.3d 1038 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in the District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Errata - appendices to brief of appellant.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
06/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Amended AppendixEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/11/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/22/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/22/2011Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
08/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/26/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/12/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs. Called counsel and requested motion be resubmitted to C-Track, rejected by system yesterdayEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/24/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/22/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/22/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal