judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ (ANDRES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32852
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ (ANDRES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37205
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143651Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/12/2000 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/12/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.)
09/17/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance.
09/22/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
10/06/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Filed Order on September 22, 1998, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is granted. The fast track statement shall be filed and served no later than October 21, 1998.
10/13/1998TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/16/98 and 6/17/98. Court Reporter: Pauline C. May.
10/16/1998TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn.
10/22/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
11/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Filed Order counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.
11/04/1998MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Page Limitation on Fast Track Statement. To wit: 14 pages.
11/04/1998Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement with Appendix attached.
11/20/1998MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Fast Track Statement.
12/01/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filed Order the clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement submitted on November 4, 1998. On November 20, 1998, respondent filed a motion to strike the fast track statement in this appeal. In light of this court's determination that good cause exists to file the fast track statement received on November 4, 1998, respondent's motion is denied. The fast track response shall be filed and served within 20 days of this order.
12/01/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement with Appendix attached.
12/18/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
02/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[Neither party has objected to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts. We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. fn3[Trial counsel Joseph Sciscento has fulfilled his obligations under NRAP 3C. We would entertain a motion to withdraw by attorney Sciscento.]
04/05/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 20, 1999.
04/21/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 4/20/99.
04/21/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
05/25/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark.
06/25/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 28, 1999.
06/29/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 6/28/99.
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 12, 2000 at the hour of 9:00 a.m. for 1/2 hr. in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB).
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB.
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." Maupin, J. and Shearing, J. Becker, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03313
03/20/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 00-04410
04/11/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-05762
04/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06844
04/27/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2000. 00-06844