judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMPSON VS. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE

Case Information: 32843
Short Caption:THOMPSON VS. FIRST AMERICAN TITLECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36167
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A355944Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1998 / Gladstone, ArthurSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Filing fee of $200. (Michael L. Kulwin - check no. 1428).
08/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
08/24/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Arthur A. Gladstone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/16/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
09/24/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Docketing Statement.
09/25/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed September 24, 1998, is granted. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on September 16, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith.
09/25/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/28/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (MISSING DOCUMENT)
11/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a) (1).
11/25/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
03/10/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 3/9/99).
03/11/1999MotionFiled Motion. Appellants Motion for Leave to Submit Appendix to the Supreme Court of Nevada.
03/11/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 3/10/99).
03/12/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed March 11, 1999, is granted. The appendix to the appellant's opening brief provisionally submitted on March 11, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith.
03/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/14/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 4/12/99).
04/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Statutory Authorities.
04/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix.
05/18/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief.
10/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address of Counsel to Appellant. (Michael Kulwin)
01/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address of Counsel for Appellant. (Michael Kulwin)
02/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-02404
02/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted to the Northern Nevada Panel this date. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
03/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Order of Remand with Instructions. " . . . we remand this case to the district court for the entry of an amended judgment to enter findings of fact and conclusions of law on the record." Any challenge to the amended judgment must be made by the filing of a new notice of appeal. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-05009
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06684
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. 00-06684