judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD GOINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0218
Short Caption:DONALD GOINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-13612-10Filed Date:02/23/2011

Opening Event Date:02/23/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald Goines Y
Edward GainYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sean M. Lewis YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/23/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Edward Gain, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Edward Gain, Esquire
04/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (32 pgs/Price) 12/14/10 proc.
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (128 pgs/Price) 12/15/10 proc.
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (171 pgs/Price) 12/16/10 proc.
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (195 pgs/Gilliam) 12/20-21/10 proc. w/cd
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX
06/06/2011RECORD COPIES
06/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/07/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED documents)
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to August 12, 2011
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for extension to 8/12/11.
08/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File until August 15, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/16/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)Granted
08/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file appellant's brief and appendix.
08/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/19/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within whihc to file the brief to 10/19/11
10/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/17/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/07/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/14/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Oberly,Belson
04/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
05/14/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
05/14/2012FiledMandate