judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JULIE ANN JACOBSEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0120)
Case Number:S-11-0120Case Docketed On:05/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JULIE ANN JACOBSEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JULIE ANN JACOBSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJulie Ann JacobsenRobert W. Southard
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel
Opinion Number:2012 WY 105
Citation:281 P.3d 356 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/24/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/27/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Robert W. Southard for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/12/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/25/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/26/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/29/2011Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
10/31/2011Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
10/31/2011Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
11/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Partial Remand and Appellant's Motion for Stay of Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Order - Denying Motion for Partial RemandOrderDenyFinal
12/30/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/14/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/08/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jeffrey Scott Pope obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, confidential papers; Volume VI, original papers; Volumes VII-VIII, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/02/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robert Southard obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/17/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robert Southard II for Appellant; Jeffrey Pope for Appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
04/17/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/01/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/17/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/21/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/20/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal