judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

H. W. MIERS, ET AL. v. HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS

Case: A-4510
A-4510
02/09/1954
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
H. W. MIERS, ET AL.
HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/1954Supplemental Brief filed
02/10/1954Supplemental Brief filed
02/09/1954Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/31/1954Opinion issued
03/01/1954Supplemental Brief filed
02/26/1954Letter Filed
02/10/1954Supplemental Brief filed
02/09/1954Certified Question filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Housing Authority of the City of Dallas, TexasAppellee
H. W. Miers, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information