judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBINSON (BRYAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34933
Short Caption:ROBINSON (BRYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55475
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141241Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/27/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-09684
11/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Late Filing of Docketing Statement. 99-11574
11/23/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on November 8, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-11728
11/23/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-10957
11/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Late Filing of Request for Transcripts. 99-11839
12/06/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The request for transcripts provisionally submitted on November 29, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-12122
12/06/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 24, 1998-All Pending Motions; April 6, 1999-All Pending Motions; June 24, 1999-Motion to Amend Information; June 28, 1999-All Pending Motions; July 12, 1999-All Pending Motions; July 13, 1999-July 22, 1999-Trial; September 9, 1999-Sentencing. To Court Reporter: 99-11841
01/06/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 24, 1998. Court Reporter: Angela Campagna. 00-00208
02/01/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 3, 2000. 00-01595
02/16/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. 06/24/99; 07/12/99 and 09/09/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 00-02442
02/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-03130
03/01/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before April 3, 2000. 00-03233
04/05/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/3/00. 00-05479
04/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-05480
04/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, all requested transcripts have been filed except the transcript for proceedings held on April 6, 1999, and June 28, 1999. Accordingly, court reporter Angela Campagna or court reporter Yvonne Valentin, whomever is responsible for the remaining transcripts, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the remaining transcripts. Fn1[The transcripts for porceedings held on July 13, 1999, and July 22, 1999, were included in the appendix filed with appellant's opening brief. 00-06399
05/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-07454
05/15/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. from court reporter Yvonne Valentin. 00-08110
05/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. To court reporter Yvonne Valentin. Due date: 5 days.
06/07/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/5/00. 00-09609
06/07/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 04/06/99 (2) and 06/28/99. Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. 00-09612
06/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-10949
06/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Clark County Clerk to certify and transmit original exhibits (autopsy photographs).
04/02/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-05649
04/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: State's Exhibits 32 through 36 and State's Exhibits 38 through 42 (autopsy photographs) this day. 01-05675
04/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2001. 01-05675