judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUMMER PERKINS and MARK PERKINS v. IVINSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Case Heading (S-09-0208)
Case Number:S-09-0208Case Docketed On:10/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:SUMMER PERKINS and MARK PERKINS v. IVINSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Full Title:SUMMER PERKINS and MARK PERKINS, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. IVINSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSummer PerkinsSteven Gregory Greenlee
AppellantMark PerkinsSteven Gregory Greenlee
AppelleeIvinson Memorial HospitalRichard Grant Schneebeck
Melissa Rae Theriault

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Limitation of Actions
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/16/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/19/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to dismiss - involuntary.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - appellee Ivinson Memorial Hospital.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/08/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/08/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/09/2010Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
02/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/17/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/23/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/26/2010Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 18EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 18EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/01/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/01/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/03/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/2/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal