judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF ARLINGTON, TEXAS, ET AL. v. JIM CANNON, ET AL.

Case: A-4513
A-4513
02/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF ARLINGTON, TEXAS, ET AL.
JIM CANNON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/19/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/16/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/1956Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Opinion issued
04/19/1954Supplemental Brief filed
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1954Response to Petition
02/11/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jim Cannon, et al.Respondent
City of Arlington, Texas, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information