judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SENGEL VS. IGT

Case Information: 32833
Short Caption:SENGEL VS. IGTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9706575Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Agosti, Rose, YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/24/1998 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/29/2000 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/29/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/12/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Filing fee of $200. (White Law Chtd. - check no. 03523).
08/12/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
08/12/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Voluntary recusal of Justice Young from participation in this matter (Lionel, Sawyer firm).
08/13/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose. Voluntary recusal of Justice Rose from participation in this matter (Gaming related).
08/24/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/25/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Hearing - 4/14/98. Court Reporter: Debbie Arnaud.
09/03/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/13/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We direct the clerk to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] (Caption and case cards amended).
12/09/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Letter from attorney John A. White requesting status of appeal.
12/10/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Letter from attorney John A. White. They have received the order filed 12/8/98.
12/31/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice pursuant NRAP Rule 44. (No action required. Constitutionality of Gaming Board decision questioned.d1)
01/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit of Mailing Notice Pursuant to NRAP Rule 44.
02/18/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Voluntary recusal of Justice Agosti from participation in this matter. (Sat in district court proceedings).
02/18/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 2/16/99).
02/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 through 4. (Mailed on: 2/16/99).
02/19/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit of Mailing Appellant's Opening Brief.
02/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Amended Affidavit of Mailing Appellant's Opening Brief and Addendum to Appellant's Opening Brief.
03/18/1999BriefFiled Brief. Answering Brief of Respondents IGT, Silver Legacy, et al. (Mailed on: hand delivered 3/18/99).
04/20/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 4/19/99).
04/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplement to Appendix including Alphabetical Index to Appendix Documents.
10/06/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for December 16, 1999 at the hour of 1:30 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City.(En Banc)
10/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order Rescheduling Argument and Order of Appointment. This appeal is currently scheduled for oral argument on December 16, 1999, at 1:30 p.m. before the en banc court. We direct the clerk to reschedule this appeal on the court's next available en banc calendar. The Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, being disquailified, the Honorable David Zenoff, Senior Judge, is assigned to sit and participate in this matter for all further proceedings.
02/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for March 29, 2000 at the hour of 8:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (En Banc) 00-01633
03/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-04093
03/16/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief. Mailed on: 3/14/00. 00-04218
03/17/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplemental Memorandum of Respondents IGT, Silver Legacy. 00-04324
03/27/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Marilyn Newton, pool coordinator (Reno Gazette-Journal) requesting cameras in the courtroom during oral argument. 00-04892
03/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A request for the purpose of photographic and electronic coverage of the hearing to be held Wednesday, March 29, 2000, at 8:30 a.m., in the above-entitled matter. Permission is granted for photographic and electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matter, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. All persons participating in such photographic and electronic coverage shall observe the standards set forth in the Supreme Court Rules in all respects, and Marilyn Newton of the Reno Gazette-Journal is designated as pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before commencement of the hearing. 00-04981
03/29/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. WM/MS/ML/NB/DZ
06/14/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Leavitt, J. We concur: Maupin, J., Shearing, J., Becker, J. I concur in result only: Zenoff, S.J. fn4[The Honorable David Zenoff, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the Honorable Deborah Agosti, Justice. The Honorable Robert Rose, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Cliff Young, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this appeal.] 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. En Banc-ML/WM/MS/NB/DZ 00-10046
06/29/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. John A. White withdraws as counsel for Cengiz Sengel. 00-11135
06/30/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/10/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Cengiz Sengel-check no. 117.
07/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 29, 2000, counsel for appellant, John A. White, filed a notice of withdrawal as attorney of record. On June 30, 2000, appellant submitted a petition for rehearing in proper person from which it appears that appellant consents to the withdrawal of attorney White. fn1[Althugh appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person petition for rehearing insofar as it relates to attorney White's motion to withdrawal. We express no opinion on mertis of that proper person petition at this time.] We approve that notice of withdrawal and deem the withdrawal to be effective as of the date of filing, June 29, 2000. The clerk shall forthwith remove attorney White from the docket of this appeal as attorney for appellant. 00-12257
09/22/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[The Honorable David Zenoff, Senior Justice, was appointed by the court to sit in place of the Honorable Deborah Agosti, Justice. The Honorable Robert Rose, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Cliff Young, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] En Banc-WM/MS/ML/NB/DZ 00-16801
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16997
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16997