judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AUBREY LASHAWN LAWSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0209)
Case Number:S-09-0209Case Docketed On:10/21/2009
Linked To: S-09-0061 , S-10-0001
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:AUBREY LASHAWN LAWSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AUBREY LASHAWN LAWSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAubrey Lashawn LawsonDiane M. Lozano
Eric M. Alden
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/21/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (Briefing resumed in S-09-0061)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/27/2009Order - Stay briefing (pending docketing of third Notice of Appeal)OrderStay briefingFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter, resumes briefing in stayed casesNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits; Volume VI, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/15/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/23/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
11/23/2010Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
11/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Brief of Appellant on Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
12/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/14/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/15/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal