judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ECOSYSTEM RESOURCES, L.C. v. BROADBENT LAND & RESOURCES, LLC and SOUTH & JONES TIMBER COMPANY, INC.

Case Heading (S-11-0143)
Case Number:S-11-0143Case Docketed On:06/09/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:ECOSYSTEM RESOURCES, L.C. v. BROADBENT LAND & RESOURCES, LLC and SOUTH & JONES TIMBER COMPANY, INC.
Full Title:ECOSYSTEM RESOURCES, L.C., Appellant (Defendant), v. BROADBENT LAND & RESOURCES, LLC, Appellee (Plaintiff), and SOUTH & JONES TIMBER COMPANY, INC., Appellee (Involuntary Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantECOSYSTEM RESOURCES, L.C.Phillip Wm. Lear
James S. Lowrie
Nathan D. Thomas
AppelleeBroadbent Land & Resources, LLCClayton B. Thomas
Weston W. Reeves
Mark W. Gifford
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeSouth & Jones Timber Company, Inc.Clayton B. Thomas
Weston W. Reeves
Mark W. Gifford
Anna M. Reeves Olson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Natural Resources - Timber
Opinion Number:2012 WY 49
Citation:275 P.3d 413

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/09/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/10/2011Event - Phone Call from Counsel for Appellee re caption, corrected.EventPhone CallFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice of Correction to CaptionNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
07/26/2011Brief - Appellant and Certificate of CostsBriefAppellantFinal
07/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. Wrong case number on pleadings. Cover of pleadings indicates James S. Lowrie and Nathan D. Thomas as counsel, but they are not admitted pro hac vice and not added as counsel for appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted Mr. Lear's office and advised that a motion for admission pro hac vice to the Wyoming Supreme Court is required for co-counsel.EventPhone CallFinal
07/27/2011Motion - Admission pro hac vice - James Lowrie, Nathan Thomas.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/01/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - James S. Lowrie and Nathan D. Thomas for AppellantOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
09/12/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/30/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark W. Gifford for appellee Broadbent Land & Resources.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Phillip Wm. Lear and James S. Lowrie for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/10/2011Notice-Incoming - No designation of record filed by counsel for appelleesNotice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
10/10/2011Order - Sanction - designation of record - Counsel for AppelleesOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
10/12/2011Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleading - Copy of plaintiff/appellees' designation of record.Notice-IncomingDistrict Court PleadingFinal
10/17/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, eighteen volumes. Volumes I - XI, Original Papers; Volume XII - XIVI, Transcripts; Volume XVI - XVIII, Trial Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/09/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Phillip Wm. Lear, Nathan D. Thomas and James S. Lowrie, argument by Mr. Lowrie for appellant; Mark W. Gifford, Anna M. Reeves Olson, Clayton B. Thomas, argument by Mr. Gifford for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record (two boxes) signed for 4/25/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal