judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PATRICK C. BERNARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0240
Short Caption:PATRICK C. BERNARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD14649-10Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/09/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/06/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPatrick C. Bernard YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Enid Hinkes, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/09/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Enid Hinkes, Esquire
03/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (89pgs/Tape) 2/22/11 proc. w/CD
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/19/2011RECORD INDEX
04/19/2011RECORD COPIES
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/18/2011APPENDIX
06/13/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 20, 2011 (no oppo)
06/27/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 20, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/20/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/20/2011FiledBriefing Completed
07/13/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/06/2012FiledLetter From appellant's counsel regarding the argument date. Wanted to make sure the case was not inadvertently left off the calendar (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/09/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Fisher,Easterly,King
05/15/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
06/06/2013FiledMandate
08/08/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)