judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KELLY VS. KELLY

Case Information: 38369
Short Caption:KELLY VS. KELLYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 31622Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/30/2001 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nancy Porter Ltd.--check no. 3322.
08/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14320
08/30/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/10/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15212
09/14/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell.
09/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Substitution of Shawn B. Meador of the law firm of Woodburn and Wedge, as attorney of record in the appeal process only in the place and stead of Nancy Porter. 01-16437
10/01/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 24, 2001. Court Reporter: Tia H. Lange. 01-16482
10/05/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell.
11/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 31, 2001. 01-18819
04/09/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-06308
05/01/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-07662
05/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days. 02-08428
05/14/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 16, 2001. To Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 02-08463
05/21/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 16, 2001. Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 02-08939
05/29/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-09398
07/26/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-12881
08/20/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-13069
08/20/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/29/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 22, 2002. 02-13069